# 8 Super Smart Math Tricks For Faster Calculations!

Math can be made really easy once you know some tricks that can get you to calculate faster than a calculator! Usually, when you solve math problems in your boards, or even your JEE and NEET, it takes a lot of time to end up using your rough sheet to calculate. This method can take away a lot of your precious time, leaving you unable to finish the paper in time. To avoid these problems and to up your math game in general, while bruising away all your woes about the subject, here are the top tricks you need to know for quicker calculations!

First things first, having the right educational partner is extremely crucial when it comes to learning. **At Tutoratti, we believe that online and offline coaching** should be made extremely personalized and affordable since it is all set to be the next big thing in the country. Our personalized online sessions, effective learning material, and experienced educators, all contribute to an exceptional online coaching experience that you can be a part of. **Coaching JEE, NEET, CET, 10th and 12 Boards students** for years together, at in Maharashtra at Pune (Sinhagad Road, Kondhwa, Aundh, Camp, and Kothrud), Pimpri Chinchwad, Raigad-Panvel, and Navi Mumbai-Kharghar.

Now that you know how and where to get your concepts sorted, let’s get to the best tips on how to choose Smart work over hard work.

**Square That Two-Digit Number Instantly**

This handy little trick works wonders when you need to crunch those numbers to derive a square for two-digit numbers!

Let’s use the number 35 as an example.

- Step 1: Multiply the first digit by itself plus 1.
- Step 2: Put a 25 at the end.

35 squared = [3 x (3 + 1)] & 25

[3 x (3 + 1)] = 12

12 & 25 = 1225

35 squared = 1225

**Multiply Like A Pro**

When multiplying large numbers, if one of the numbers is even, divide the first number in half, and then double the second number. This method will solve the problem quickly. For instance, consider

20 x 120

Step 1: Divide the 20 by 2, which equals 10. Double 120, which equals 240.

Then multiply your two answers together.

10 x 240 = 2400

The answer to 20 x 120 is 2,400.

**Add Up Large Numbers!**

Adding large numbers just in your head can be difficult. This method shows how to simplify this process by making all the numbers a multiple of 10. Here is an example:

644 + 238

While these numbers are hard to contend with, rounding them up will make them more manageable. So, 644 becomes 650, and 238 becomes 240.

Now, add 650 and 240 together. The total is 890. To find the answer to the original equation, it must be determined how much we added to the numbers to round them up.

650 – 644 = 6 and 240 – 238 = 2

Now, add 6 and 2 together for a total of 8

To find the answer to the original equation, 8 must be subtracted from the 890.

890 – 8 = 882

So the answer to 644 +238 is 882.

**Anything Multiplied By 5 Is Easy**

When multiplying the number 5 by an even number, there is a quick way to find the answer.

For example, 5 x 4 =

- Step 1: Take the number being multiplied by 5 and cut it in half, this makes the number 4 become number 2.
- Step 2: Add a zero to the number to find the answer. In this case, the answer is 20.

5 x 4 = 20

When multiplying an odd number times 5, the formula is a bit different.

For instance, consider 5 x 3.

- Step 1: Subtract one from the number being multiplied by 5, in this instance the number 3 becomes the number 2.
- Step 2: Now halve the number 2, which makes it the number 1. Make 5 the last digit. The number produced is 15, which is the answer.

5 x 3 = 15

**Subtracting from 1000**

Here’s a basic rule to subtract a large number from 1,000: Subtract every number except the last from 9 and subtract the final number from 10

For example:

1,000 – 556

Step 1: Subtract 5 from 9 = 4

Step 2: Subtract 5 from 9 = 4

Step 3: Subtract 6 from 10 = 4

The answer is 444.

- Divide In An Instant

Here’s a quick way to know when a number can be evenly divided by these certain numbers:

- 10 if the number ends in 0
- 9 when the digits are added together and the total is evenly divisible by 9
- 8 if the last three digits are evenly divisible by 8 or are 000
- 6 if it is an even number and when the digits are added together the answer is evenly divisible by 3
- 5 if it ends in a 0 or 5
- 4 if it ends in 00 or a two-digit number that is evenly divisible by 4
- 3 when the digits are added together and the result is evenly divisible by the number 3
- 2 if it ends in 0, 2, 4, 6, or 8

**6. Tougher Multiplications**

When multiplying large numbers, if one of the numbers is even, divide the first number in half, and then double the second number. This method will solve the problem quickly. For instance, consider

20 x 120

Step 1: Divide the 20 by 2, which equals 10. Double 120, which equals 240.

Then multiply your two answers together.

10 x 240 = 2400

The answer to 20 x 120 is 2,400.

**Multiplying By 9 Like A Pro**

This is an easy method that is helpful for multiplying any number by 9. Here is how it works:

Let’s use the example of 9 x 3.

Step 1: Subtract 1 from the number that is being multiplied by 9.

3 – 1 = 2

The number 2 is the first number in the answer to the equation.

Step 2: Subtract that number from the number 9.

9 – 2 = 7

The number 7 is the second number in the answer to the equation.

So, 9 x 3 = 27

**Percentages ASAP**

Let us take; we have to find the percentage of the number 5% of 475, follow the steps.

- For the given number, move the decimal point over by one place. 475 becomes 47.5
- Then divide the number 47.5 by 2, we get 23.75.
- 23.75 is the solution to the given problem.

To find such interesting blogs on how you can learn better for your exams, be sure to browse through our blog section on the Tutoratti website! Happy Learning!